Supporting the University for over 50 Years
October 2018 marked 50 years for the вÊÍø Foundation. Within that time, the вÊÍø Foundation's mission statement has remained the same: to attract, acquire, and manage donors’ charitable gifts to support and sustain the goals of the вÊÍø.
Making a gift is always a choice, and the вÊÍø Foundation recognizes how fortunate it is for the alumni and friends who made the decision to invest in our students, faculty and programs. The importance of a higher education is the shared value which connects all of us.Â
The вÊÍø Foundation must always strive to preserve the power of education as the single most important thread that pulls us together in unity of purpose. Leadership and stewardship in these endeavors is strongly attributed to the вÊÍø Foundation Board of Directors.Â
Executive Committee
The Executive Committee is comprised of the officers of the Board, the past chair, and directors-at-large.
Chair | Jean M. Blanton '01 |
President | Andrea R. Gentry '05 |
Chair Elect | |
Vice Chair for Alumni | Ashley K. Riordan-Elpers '05 M'21 |
Vice Chair for Development | C. Wayne Kinney '77 |
Vice Chair for Planning | Neal A. Franklin |
Secretary | |
Treasurer | John L. Schutz ’82 |
Assistant Treasurer | Steven J. Bridges ’89 M’95 |
Administrative Advisor | |
Past Chair | Jeffrey L. Wilmes ’81 |
Nominating Committee Chair | Randall L. Haaff ’84 |
Upcoming Meeting Dates
- Thursday, September 19, 2024
- Thursday, November 21, 2024
- Thursday, February 20, 2025
- Thursday, May 15, 2025
Former Board Chairs
Joseph E. O’Daniel †|
Ronald D. Romain ’73 |
Albert A. Woll †|
Thomas E. Topper †|
E. Donald Elliott †|
Bix Branson |
R. Jack Brunton †|
Kevin M. Eastridge |
C. Wayne Worthington †|
Bruce H. Baker |
Ted C. Ziemer Jr. †|
Marie Bussing |
Robert E. Griffin †|
Kevin L. Hammett ’90 |
John M. Dunn |
Karen S. Walker |
Carolyn S. Georgette †|
Trudy J. Stock '86 |
†Deceased